SHEMESH v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC et al
Plaintiff: ERAN SHEMESH
Defendant: CHASE BANK (USA), N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, SERVIS ONE, INC. d/b/a BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES, TRANS UNION LLC and SERVIS ONE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20103
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by CHASE BANK (USA), N.A..(TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant is given an extension until 1/20/2020 to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/7/2020. (sm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GORDON, BENJAMIN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extension of time to answer by SERVIS ONE, INC.. (DOMINCZYK, THOMAS)
December 23, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #17 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, CHASE BANK (USA), N.A., SERVIS ONE, INC. has been GRANTED. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC and SERVIS ONE, INC. answer due 1/6/2020, CHASE BANK (USA) answer due 1/9/2020 (ams, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney BENJAMIN EVAN GORDON for OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC added. (GORDON, BENJAMIN)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial Services.. (DOMINCZYK, THOMAS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS R. DOMINCZYK on behalf of SERVIS ONE, INC. (DOMINCZYK, THOMAS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Chase.. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHASE BANK (USA), N.A.. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER B. TURCOTTE on behalf of CHASE BANK (USA), N.A. (TURCOTTE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/20/2019. (kd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERAN SHEMESH. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERAN SHEMESH. CHASE BANK (USA), N.A. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERAN SHEMESH. SERVIS ONE, INC. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERAN SHEMESH. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERAN SHEMESH. TRANS UNION LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., and TransUnion as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN on behalf of TRANS UNION LLC (BROWN, WILLIAM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHASE BANK (USA), N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, SERVIS ONE, INC., TRANS UNION LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 13, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK (USA), N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC, SERVIS ONE, INC. d/b/a BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES, TRANS UNION LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10104440) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERAN SHEMESH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEMESH v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK (USA), N.A.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER B. TURCOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN EVAN GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVIS ONE, INC. d/b/a BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVIS ONE, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS R. DOMINCZYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERAN SHEMESH
Represented By: YAAKOV SAKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?