GLAUDE v. SLAUGHTER et al
Petitioner: MICHELET GLAUDE
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY and MR. JAMES SLAUGHTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv20139
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Respondents. (POGANY, STEPHEN)
January 6, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Letter to Judge Chesler filed by Stephen Pogany on 1/6/20 was submitted incorrectly as an Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING Letter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to respondents.. (POGANY, STEPHEN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. POGANY on behalf of JAMES SLAUGHTER (POGANY, STEPHEN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Carol M. Henderson (Chief, Appellate Bureau) to Frank J. Ducoat (Director, Appellate Bureau). (jc, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall re-open this matter and serve this Order's NEF upon the State of New Jersey, etc. (Copy of order mailed to Petitioner). Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/11/19. (jc, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHELET GLAUDE. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (jc, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Petitioner is granted leave to amend his petition within 30 days, etc. (New petition mailed). Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/20/19. (jc, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW041042.), filed by MICHELET GLAUDE. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLAUDE v. SLAUGHTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MR. JAMES SLAUGHTER
Represented By: STEPHEN A. POGANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHELET GLAUDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?