RUTHERFORD v. OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS et al
Plaintiff: CARL RUTHERFORD
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. and OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS
Case Number: 2:2019cv20201
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; It is hereby stipulated and agreed that this action, is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 1/3/2020. (sms)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS. (WEST, MARTIN)
December 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 1/21/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; granting #6 Plaintiffs' letter request that the Motion to Dismiss in this matter be carried by two motion cycles to January 21. 2020; etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/3/2019. (sms)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Richard Winograd re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (WINOGRAD, RICHARD)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
November 22, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 1/3/20 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/22/19. (tjg, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(WEST, MARTIN)
November 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps, )
November 14, 2019 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. identifying OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (UNITED KINGDOM), LTD. as Corporate Parent.. (WEST, MARTIN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (WEST, MARTIN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. from Superior Court of Union County, NJ, case number UNN-L-3564-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10109363), filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- State Court Am. Complaint)(WEST, MARTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUTHERFORD v. OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.
Represented By: MARTIN ROY WEST, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS
Represented By: MARTIN ROY WEST, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL RUTHERFORD
Represented By: RICHARD M. WINOGRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?