MARTE REYES v. SHEIKA et al
Plaintiff: DISMERY A. MARTE REYES and LUIS M CASTRO
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, ALI SHEIKA, ABC CO. 1-10, JANE ROE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10 and XYZ CO. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv20388
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff's Claims against Defendant FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION re #7 Stipulation. Defendant FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION terminated. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/10/2020. (dam, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from John McConnell re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal (aty). (MCCONNELL, JOHN)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (MCCONNELL, JOHN)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 2/19/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/12/2019. (jqb, )
December 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Brief)(MCCONNELL, JOHN)
November 20, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/6/2019. (bt, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JOHN COPPOLA on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (COPPOLA, DAVID)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCCONNELL, JOHN)
November 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps, )
November 15, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. MCCONNELL on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (MCCONNELL, JOHN)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION from ESSEX, case number ESX-L-7690-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10115406), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Statement, #3 Exhibit A - C)(MCCONNELL, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTE REYES v. SHEIKA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISMERY A. MARTE REYES
Represented By: ALLAN ROBERT MORDKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS M CASTRO
Represented By: ALLAN ROBERT MORDKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN M. MCCONNELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN COPPOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI SHEIKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CO. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?