BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC v. DWYER
Plaintiff: BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC
Defendant: JAMES DWYER
Case Number: 2:2019cv20406
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER that if moving for default judgment, Plaintiff is to submit a brief (no more than 7 pages) with any materials in support of the default judgment motion, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/14/2020. (ams, )
January 14, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James Dwyer for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ams, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Default by BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC against James Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Certification Margaret Wood, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(WOOD, MARGARET)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for James Dwyer served on Margaret Normandin on 12/19/2019, filed by BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC. (WOOD, MARGARET)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAMES DWYER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC. (WOOD, MARGARET)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET O'ROURKE WOOD on behalf of BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC (WOOD, MARGARET)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES DWYER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10117059), filed by BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WOOD, MARGARET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC v. DWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES DWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE SEA PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: MARGARET O'ROURKE WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?