VASILE et al v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ERICA VASILE and TIMOTHY VASILE
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., CORELLE BRANDS, L.L.C., INSTANT BRANDS, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10 and JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10 fictitious names
Case Number: 2:2019cv20477
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMAZON.COM, INC..(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INSTANT BRANDS, INC. identifying Instant Brands Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by INSTANT BRANDS, INC..(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/23/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/27/2019. (kd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by AMAZON.COM, INC..(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(KAMARIS, KARLEY)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (KAMARIS, KARLEY)
November 20, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Disclosure Statement, The Corporate Disclosure Statement is to be filed as a separate entry after the filing of the Notice of Removal or Complaint. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld, )
November 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
November 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-7037-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10121664), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification Rule 7.1 Disclosure for Amazon.com, Inc., #4 Certification Rule 7.1 Disclosure for Amazon.com Services, Inc.)(KAMARIS, KARLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VASILE et al v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. REGAN
Represented By: KARLEY E. KAMARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTANT BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: KARLEY E. KAMARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. REGAN
Represented By: KARLEY E. KAMARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10 fictitious names
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA VASILE
Represented By: E. DREW BRITCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY VASILE
Represented By: E. DREW BRITCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?