USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. TRAVIS et al
Plaintiff: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC TRAVIS, GUSTAVO GARCIA, THOMAS PUZIO, MARILYN GARCIA, MELISSA PUZIO and SHANA TRAVIS
Case Number: 2:2019cv20522
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 19-18369 and 19-20522 are consolidated for all purposes under Civil Action No. 19-18369; all discovery shall proceed according to the schedule set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order entered in the Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company action (19-cv-18369, ECF No. 16); the Rule 16 Conference scheduled in the USAA Casualty Insurance Company action (19-cv-20522) for February 13, 2020 is hereby cancelled; plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended complaint in the Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company action (19-cv-18369) on or before January 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/13/2020. (sm)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against GUSTAVO GARCIA, MARILYN GARCIA, MELISSA PUZIO, THOMAS PUZIO by ERIC TRAVIS, SHANA TRAVIS.(SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Christopher H. Boyle. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. MELISSA PUZIO waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; THOMAS PUZIO waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/13/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/20/2019. (kd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against MELISSA PUZIO, THOMAS PUZIO, ERIC TRAVIS, SHANA TRAVIS by MARILYN GARCIA, GUSTAVO GARCIA.(GERTLER, STEPHEN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. GUSTAVO GARCIA waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; MARILYN GARCIA waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. ERIC TRAVIS waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; SHANA TRAVIS waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GUSTAVO GARCIA, MARILYN GARCIA, MELISSA PUZIO, THOMAS PUZIO, ERIC TRAVIS, SHANA TRAVIS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to ERIC TRAVIS, SHANA TRAVIS. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to GUSTAVO GARCIA, MARILYN GARCIA. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to MELISSA PUZIO, THOMAS PUZIO. (BOYLE, CHRISTOPHER)
November 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (dam, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10123978) with JURY DEMAND filed by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. TRAVIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC TRAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL STEWART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO GARCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. GERTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN GARCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. GERTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANA TRAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL STEWART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER HUGH BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?