GUJRAL et al v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DANIELLE EMERSON and RANBIR GUJRAL
Defendant: BMW AG, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC, BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGELSELLSCHAFT and BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv20581
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Reassign Case (NAGEL, BRUCE)
January 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Reassign Case . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Reassign Case by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Reassign, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RANBIR GUJRAL, DANIELLE EMERSON. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (MATLOFF, RANDEE)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON on behalf of BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. SANTOLI on behalf of DANIELLE EMERSON, RANBIR GUJRAL (SANTOLI, JOSEPH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDEE M. MATLOFF on behalf of DANIELLE EMERSON, RANBIR GUJRAL (MATLOFF, RANDEE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGELSELLSCHAFT, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
November 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW AG, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10129322) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RANBIR GUJRAL, DANIELLE EMERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NAGEL, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUJRAL et al v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE EMERSON
Represented By: BRUCE HELLER NAGEL
Represented By: RANDEE M. MATLOFF
Represented By: JOSEPH R. SANTOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANBIR GUJRAL
Represented By: BRUCE HELLER NAGEL
Represented By: RANDEE M. MATLOFF
Represented By: JOSEPH R. SANTOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGELSELLSCHAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?