RAITSIN v. UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SOFIA RAITSIN
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES, INC., EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. and UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20794
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC.. (FROME, CAROLYN)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. identifying United Airlines Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FROME, CAROLYN)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN GERACI FROME on behalf of EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC., UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 App. for Clerk's Extension, #2 App. for Clerk's Extension)(FROME, CAROLYN)
January 10, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service, and #5 Return of Service filed by A. BOHRER on 1/10/2020 were submitted incorrectly as an "Affidavit of Service." If filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and the Complaint, do NOT use this event. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (or Summons Returned Executed as to USA, when applicable). This message is for informational purposes, and there is no further action required. (dam, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United Airlines, Inc. on January 8, 2020, filed by SOFIA RAITSIN. (BOHRER, ABRAM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United Airlines Holdings, Inc. on January 8, 2020, filed by SOFIA RAITSIN. (BOHRER, ABRAM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on ExpressJet Airlines, Inc. on January 8, 2020, filed by SOFIA RAITSIN. (BOHRER, ABRAM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC., UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
November 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., United Airlines Holdings, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10141798) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Sofia Raitsin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BOHRER, ABRAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAITSIN v. UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN GERACI FROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN GERACI FROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN GERACI FROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOFIA RAITSIN
Represented By: ABRAM I. BOHRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?