CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM v. PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Defendant: KENNETH Y. TANJI, CHARLES F. LOWREY and PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20839
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MAEVE O'CONNOR and SUSAN REAGAN GITTES, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Susan Reagan Gittes to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10261228.) (O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Maeve O'Connor to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10261216.) (O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time within which Defendants must respond to the presently pending Complaint is stayed, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/14/20. (jc, )
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Application for pro hac vice admission of Maeve O'Connor and Susan Reagan Gittes, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/14/20. (jc, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Tricia B. O'Reilly to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Tricia B. O'Reilly to the Honorable Cathy L. Walsh re: Pro Hac Vice Admission on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Maeve O'Connor, #2 Certification of Susan Reagan Gittes, #3 Supporting Certification of Tricia B. O'Reilly, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KENNETH Y. TANJI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/17/20. (jc, )
January 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/16/20. (jc, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (O'REILLY, TRICIA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SELINA MIRIAM ELLIS on behalf of All Defendants (ELLIS, SELINA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA B. O'REILLY on behalf of All Defendants (O'REILLY, TRICIA)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. KENNETH Y. TANJI served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. CHARLES F. LOWREY waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHARLES F. LOWREY, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., KENNETH Y. TANJI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
November 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES F. LOWREY, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., KENNETH Y. TANJI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10143757) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws, #2 Certification Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 11.2, #3 Certificate of Non-Arbitrability Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 201.1(d)(3), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(PEARLMAN, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM v. PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH Y. TANJI
Represented By: TRICIA B. O'REILLY
Represented By: SELINA MIRIAM ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES F. LOWREY
Represented By: TRICIA B. O'REILLY
Represented By: SELINA MIRIAM ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: TRICIA B. O'REILLY
Represented By: SELINA MIRIAM ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF WARREN POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?