BUTT v. MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ABID BUTT and ABID B. BUTT
Defendant: MENA ROMAN and MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv21086
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Voluntary DISMISSAL re #7 Notice. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/17/2020. (dam, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABID B. BUTT (CRISCIONE, GALEN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on MGR ENT LLC on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mena Roman on 12/12/2019, filed by ABID B. BUTT. (CRISCIONE, GALEN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
December 6, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC. (CRISCIONE, GALEN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ABID BUTT as to MENA ROMAN. (CRISCIONE, GALEN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, MENA ROMAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10159072) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ABID BUTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRISCIONE, GALEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTT v. MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENA ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGR ENT SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABID BUTT
Represented By: GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABID B. BUTT
Represented By: GALEN JOSEPH CRISCIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?