DeFrank et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa DeFrank, Hollis Stavn, Wendy Dowds, Mark DiTroia, Maria Keene, Carl Gersh, Ashley Nuibe and chris garcia
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv21401
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before February 25, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before April 7, 2020. Defendant shall file its reply on or before April 24, 2020. The parties are directed to continue good faith discussions concerning proceeding with limited discovery pending resolution of defendant's motion to dismiss. A telephone conference is scheduled for February 19, 2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/13/2020. (as, )
February 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/13/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: The parties should be prepared to discuss the issues raised in the joint letter dated February 7, 2020 and entered February 11, 2020 (ECF No. 40) at the in-person initial scheduling conference scheduled for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/11/2020. (as, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the application for the pro hac vice admission of Kip T. Bollin,Esq. AND Jesse L. Jenike-Godshalk, Esq. AND Melanie M. Lazor, Esq.is granted re etc. #38 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/10/2020. (bt, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 40 Letter re: motion to stay from Joseph P. LaSala. (sm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 38 Letter from Joseph P. LaSala, Esq. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 101.1(c). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Joseph P. LaSala, Esq., #3 Certificate of Service)(LASALA, JOSEPH)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/9/2020. (as, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH P. LASALA on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc (LASALA, JOSEPH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSANA CRUZ HODGE on behalf of Lisa DeFrank, Mark DiTroia, Wendy Dowds, Carl Gersh, Maria Keene, Ashley Nuibe, chris garcia (CRUZ HODGE, SUSANA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG on behalf of Lisa DeFrank, Mark DiTroia, Wendy Dowds, Carl Gersh, Maria Keene, Ashley Nuibe, chris garcia (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
December 16, 2019 Filing 33 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00296. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 16, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Change Venue - The Clerk of Courts is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/13/2019. (bjc)
October 1, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Heather M. Hawkins as Counsel (Bollin, Kip)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim/for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/26/19. (ba)
September 20, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Bollin, Kip)
September 6, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Lisa DeFrank, Mark DiTroia, Wendy Dowds, Chris Garcia, Carl Gersh, Maria Keene, Ashley Nuibe, Hollis Stavn. (Karon, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hollis Stavn's Claims With Prejudice by Plaintiff Lisa DeFrank. (Karon, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bollin, Kip)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay. SEA's response to the Amended Complaint is hereby STAYED until such time that this Court orders after resolving SEA's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/17/2018. (mr)
August 14, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Response to the Amended Complaint by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Response Date) (Bollin, Kip)
August 7, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lisa DeFrank re #22 Amended Complaint Certificate of Service (Karon, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., filed by Lisa DeFrank, Chris Garcia, Mark DiTroia, Carl Gersh, Wendy Dowds, Maria Keene and Ashley Nuibe. (Karon, Daniel) Modified to update party names on 8/7/2018 (mr).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Order to Vacate Rule 26(f) Report; a new deadline will be set following the ruling of #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/18/18. (ba)
July 15, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time for Rule 26(f) Conference and Report by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
July 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
July 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather MacGregor Hawkins for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Hawkins, Heather)
July 11, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (ECF 16) by Plaintiffs Lisa DeFrank, Chris Garcia, Hollis Stavn. (Karon, Daniel)
June 25, 2018 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/16/2018. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
June 22, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 7/13/2018) by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bollin, Kip)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/22/18. (ba)
June 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bollin, Kip)
June 1, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. re #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Notice of Appearance, #9 Notice of Appearance (Bollin, Kip)
June 1, 2018 Notice by Clerk re #9 , #10 , and #12 : Please be aware that these documents require a certificate of service, pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filings, please file a single page certificate of service that references all three documents, use the Certificate of Service event found under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process, and link that event to your filings when prompted. (eh)
June 1, 2018 Reset Deadlines per doc. #11 : Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 6/22/2018. (eh)
May 31, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Lazor for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Lazor, Melanie)
May 31, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed April 27, 2018 by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Bollin, Kip)
May 31, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc... (Bollin, Kip)
May 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip T Bollin for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Bollin, Kip)
May 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 5/11/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. (eh)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph G. Sauder for Plaintiffs Lisa DeFrank, Chris Garcia, Hollis Stavn. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/22/18. (ba)
May 10, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #2 Summons Issued. Complaint and Summons re-sent this date to defendant by certified mail. (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2018: #1 Certified Mail Envelope) (eh).
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: The Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio has been requested to issue the complaint and summons to the defendants. The requested service was sent by certified mail on May 2, 2018. The receipt for certified mail is attached. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
May 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6425519) of Joseph G. Sauder by Plaintiffs Lisa DeFrank, Chris Garcia, Hollis Stavn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - COGS of Sauder, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
April 30, 2018 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Joseph G. Sauder, Bruce D. Greenberg, Susana Cruz Hodge (jlw)
April 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (jlw)
April 30, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6421591), filed by lisa defrank, chris garcia, Hollis Stavn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Karon, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeFrank et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa DeFrank
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Stavn
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Dowds
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark DiTroia
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Keene
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Gersh
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nuibe
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: chris garcia
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Represented By: Beau D. Hollowell
Represented By: SUSANA CRUZ HODGE
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Melanie Lazor
Represented By: Heather MacGregor Hawkins
Represented By: Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk
Represented By: Kip T Bollin
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?