J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. et al v. HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. and J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC.
Defendant: HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv21638
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Steven J. Pudell, Esq.. (PUDELL, STEVEN)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (ld, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph A. Oliva, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/7/2020. (ld, )
February 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
February 7, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia attached to D.E #10 submitted by NICOLE CROWLEY on 2/5/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicole Crowley, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph A. Olivia, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification Steven J. Pudell, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(PUDELL, STEVEN)
January 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6). Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) . (PUDELL, STEVEN)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK LACEY, JR on behalf of CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. (LACEY, JOHN)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CROWLEY, NICOLE)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE MICHELLE CROWLEY on behalf of HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (CROWLEY, NICOLE)
December 23, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #1 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2020. (qa, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. identifying ALTOHA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (CAVALLO, CHRISTIAN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. from Superior Court, Law Division: Bergen County, case number BER-L-08052-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10194510), filed by HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney CHRISTIAN ANDREW CAVALLO for HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(CAVALLO, CHRISTIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC. et al v. HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREAM RIDGE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK LACEY, JR
Represented By: STEVEN J. PUDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. FLETCHER CREAMER & SON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK LACEY, JR
Represented By: STEVEN J. PUDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HISCOX INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTIAN ANDREW CAVALLO
Represented By: NICOLE MICHELLE CROWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?