JOHN J. VACCARO, M.D. PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOHN J. VACCARO, M.D. PA and JOHN J. VACCARO
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00513
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN J. VACCARO. JOHN J. VACCARO served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
January 16, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10254339), filed by JOHN J. VACCARO, M.D. PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - W, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHN J. VACCARO, M.D. PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. VACCARO, M.D. PA
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. VACCARO
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?