EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv02113
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/1/2020. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 3/31/20. (gh, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
February 28, 2020 Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10462873), filed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - N, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?