ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. et al v. MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: ANNTAYLOR RETAIL, INC., LANE BRYANT, INC., ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. and CHARMING SHOPPES OF DELAWARE, INC.
Defendant: MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02679
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/14/20. (jc, )
April 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2020. (tjg, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE. (RADOMSKI, SEAN)
March 17, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek, )
March 13, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 4/14/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/13/20. (tjg, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (OLSEN, KENNETH)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Defendant MKM Distribution Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) of Plaintiff, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Counterclaim)(OLSEN, KENNETH)
March 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey-Law Division-Bergen County, case number BER-L-704-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10541594), filed by MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NJ Superior Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(OLSEN, KENNETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC. et al v. MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKM DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: KENNETH A. OLSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNTAYLOR RETAIL, INC.
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH RADOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANE BRYANT, INC.
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH RADOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENA RETAIL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH RADOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMING SHOPPES OF DELAWARE, INC.
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH RADOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?