MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. MYLAN API US LLC et al
Plaintiff: ORGANON USA INC. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN INC. and MYLAN API US LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03270
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN on behalf of MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SOLIMAN, CATHERINE)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (HALPERN, JAKOB)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/12/20. (LM, )
April 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. MYLAN API US LLC waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; MYLAN INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (LOWER, J.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MYLAN API US LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. MYLAN API US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN
Represented By: CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN
Represented By: CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN API US LLC
Represented By: JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN
Represented By: CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORGANON USA INC.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?