MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: ORGANON USA INC. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Defendant: MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MSN LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED and MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2020cv03314
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON CONSENT GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF GONGJUN (GARY) JI, ESQ.; Counsel shall pay the annual fee of $212.00 to the New Jersey Lawyers Fund for Client Protection; and Counsel shall make payment to the Clerk, United States District Court, in the amount $150.00; etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/22/2020. (sm)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Karin K. Sage, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Karin K. Sage, Esq., #2 Declaration Gongjun (Gary) Ji, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Admission Pro Hac Vice)(SAGE, KARIN)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/12/20. (LM, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER that MSN Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7/8/2020. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/27/2020. (ams, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Gurpreet Singh Walia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALIA, GURPREET)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by GURPREET SINGH WALIA on behalf of All Defendants (WALIA, GURPREET)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KARIN KRAFT SAGE on behalf of All Defendants (SAGE, KARIN)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. MSN LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (LOWER, J.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10610080), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: GURPREET SINGH WALIA
Represented By: KARIN KRAFT SAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN LIFE SCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED
Represented By: GURPREET SINGH WALIA
Represented By: KARIN KRAFT SAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED
Represented By: GURPREET SINGH WALIA
Represented By: KARIN KRAFT SAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORGANON USA INC.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?