DAVIES v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DHS-ICE) et al
Petitioner: NATHANIEL DAVIES, JR.
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DHS-ICE) and WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv06466
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM and ORDER re #3 Respondents' Letter with Proposed Order. Respondents' time to file an answer to the Habeas Petition is extended from 7/13/2020 to 7/27/2020. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/13/2020. (dam, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Extension Request. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting Petitioner's Application to proceed IFP. Respondent WARDEN OF THE ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY added. The Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Memorandum and Order upon respondents by regular mail. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Memorandum and Order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office. Within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this Memorandum and Order, respondents shall file and serve an answer. Within forty-five (45) days of receipt of the answer, Petitioner may file a reply to the answer. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/29/2020 (dam, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by NATHANIEL DAVIES, JR. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIES v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DHS-ICE) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATHANIEL DAVIES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DHS-ICE)
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?