DUNBAR v. TSOUKARIS
Petitioner: OLIVER J. DUNBAR
Respondent: TSOUKARIS
Case Number: 2:2020cv06576
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to OLIVER J. DUNBAR (dam, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to OLIVER J. DUNBAR (dam, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from OLIVER J. DUNBAR. (Attachments: #1 Copy of NEF, #2 Envelope)(dam, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from OLIVER J. DUNBAR. (dam, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from OLIVER J. DUNBAR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding Fee Waiver Request Application from OLIVER J. DUNBAR. (dam, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case. The Clerk shall forward Petitioner a blank form Application to Proceed IFP in a Habeas Corpus Case. If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court, in writing addressed to the Clerk, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Petitioner's writing shall include either the $5 filing fee or a complete application to proceed IFP. Upon receipt of a writing from Petitioner stating that he wishes to reopen this case, and either the $5 filing fee or a complete IFP application, the Clerk will be directed to reopen this case. etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/1/2020. (dam, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by OLIVER J. DUNBAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 1, #2 Exhibit # 2, #3 Exhibit # 3, #4 Envelope)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNBAR v. TSOUKARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OLIVER J. DUNBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?