BURGOS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICES
Plaintiff: COCO SUPERMARKET and JOHNNY BURGOS
Defendant: FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2020cv06704
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter requesting to withdraw #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/21/2020. (ams, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from David Ventoso, Esq. to witdraw motion for preliminary injunction re #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to stay 6-month suspension of Plaintiff(s) and reinstate EBT processor so as to accept SNAP benefit customers, 7 Order,. (SOTO, FRANKLIN)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for plaintiffs shall file a letter by close of business Friday, 7/17/2020, as to whether the EBT processor at Coco Supermarket is reactivated and the preliminary injunction motion is withdrawn. (See letter, DE 6). So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/15/2020. (nic, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Thandiwe Boylan. (BOYLAN, THANDIWE)
June 3, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Summons issued attached to docket entry #5 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/3/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (lag, )
June 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to stay 6-month suspension of Plaintiff(s) and reinstate EBT processor so as to accept SNAP benefit customers. Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that on or before 6/11/2020, the defendants shall submit a brief in response to plaintiff's motion in which they show cause why the requested relief of reversing the shutdown of plaintiff's EBT terminal, should not be granted pending final action of this Court; The temporary restraints are denied; Plaintiff's shall accomplish good and sufficient service of the complaint and papers in support of their motion for preliminary injunction by 6/8/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/3/2020. (ams, )
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
June 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters without address information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to stay 6-month suspension of Plaintiff(s) and reinstate EBT processor so as to accept SNAP benefit customers by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff, Johnny Burgos, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Preliminary Injuction, #3 Proposed Order)(SOTO, FRANKLIN)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coco Supermarket, Johnny Burgos ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10883652), filed by Coco Supermarket, Johnny Burgos. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Plaintiff, Johnny Burgos, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Complaint / Appeal of Administrative Decision)(SOTO, FRANKLIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURGOS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COCO SUPERMARKET
Represented By: FRANKLIN G. SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY BURGOS
Represented By: FRANKLIN G. SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FOOD AND NUTRITION SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?