REYES-RODRIGUEZ v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, GUY CIRILLO, JOHN TSOUKARIS and WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv06773
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from Emily Goldberg in response to Respondents' 6/29/20 letter re #20 Letter. (GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Respondents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GREER, CHRISTINA)
June 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 Reply to RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Danielle S. Lazarus with Exhibits)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Emily Goldberg, #2 Certification of Danielle S. Lazarus, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #17 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 Exhibit (to Document),, #15 Exhibit (to Document),, #16 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #14 Exhibit (to Document),, #15 Exhibit (to Document),, #16 Exhibit (to Document),, by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GREER, CHRISTINA)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Exhibit to #13 Response to Habeas Petition, Exhibit N by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (GREER, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 Exhibit to #13 Response to Habeas Petition, Exhibit M by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (GREER, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 Exhibit to #13 Response to Habeas Petition, Exhibit G by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (GREER, CHRISTINA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Certificate of Service)(GREER, CHRISTINA)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER on behalf of WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO (GREER, CHRISTINA)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent-Defendants will respond to the #1 Petition and #3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by 6/12/2020; Petitioner-Plaintiff will file his reply by 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/9/2020. (ams, )
June 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #2 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLAN B.K. URGENT on behalf of WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO (URGENT, ALLAN)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 Exhibit (to Document),, #4 Brief, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, (GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Emily Goldberg re Briefing Schedule. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Emily Goldberg, #2 Certification of Roberto Finzi, #3 Certification of Jonathan H. Hurwitz, #4 Certification of James H. Borod, #5 Certification of Juan J. Gascon, #6 Certification of Anna Byers, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Seal Document #2 Exhibit (to Document),, by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Goldberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Respondents Tsoukaris and Wolf are dismissed with prejudice as the sole respondent in a petition is the warden of the facility, in this case remaining Respondents Cirillo and Anderson; Within 5 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file an answer to the petition and motion; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within 3 days after the answer is filed; Within 7 days after any change in Petitioner's custody or immigration status, Respondent shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk of the Court, etc. (n/m). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/3/2020. (ams, )
June 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton. (jr)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF-PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241 AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James H. Borod with Exhibits)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, (Exhibit 10) by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (GOLDBERG, EMILY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19 and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10890952.), filed by WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Reyes Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-Phil Alagia Email, #3 Exhibit 3-Griswold Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4-Venters Declaration [REDACTED], #5 Exhibit 5-Case Review Chart, #6 Exhibit 6-Letter from John Tsoukaris to Lauren Major, #7 Exhibit 7-Amon Declaration [REDACTED], #8 Exhibit 8-Santana Declaration [REDACTED], #9 Exhibit 9-Meyer Declaration [REDACTED], #10 Exhibit 10-File Under Seal, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOLDBERG, EMILY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYES-RODRIGUEZ v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRILLO
Represented By: ALLAN B.K. URGENT
Represented By: CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ALLAN B.K. URGENT
Represented By: CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILMER MIGUEL REYES-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: EMILY B. GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?