CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv06867
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Joint Letter requesting that the Court STAY this matter in its entirety. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/30/2020. (dam, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Steven L. Penaro and Christopher Adam Seeger Requesting a Stay (Joint Letter). (PENARO, STEVEN)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN L. PENARO on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (PENARO, STEVEN)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10902006) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC.(CECCHI, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATERER'S IN THE PARK LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?