IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC et al v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: IN THE PARK CHATEAU CATERERS LLC and IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. and SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv06869
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Defendants Selective Insurance Group, Inc. and Selective Casualty Insurance Company (incorrectly named as Selective Insurance Company) re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (CORBETT, WILLIAM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
July 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(CORBETT, WILLIAM)
July 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/20/20. Please note this date is different than the date requested in the application since a response is due by 7/6/20, not 7/7/20. (jc, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM THOMAS CORBETT, JR on behalf of SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. (CORBETT, WILLIAM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BRADY, LAURA)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. identifying Selective Insurance Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BRADY, LAURA)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA A. BRADY on behalf of All Defendants (BRADY, LAURA)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of IN THE PARK CHATEAU CATERERS LLC, IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
June 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10902052) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC, IN THE PARK CHATEAU CATERERS LLC.(CECCHI, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC et al v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM THOMAS CORBETT, JR.
Represented By: LAURA A. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM THOMAS CORBETT, JR.
Represented By: LAURA A. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN THE PARK CHATEAU CATERERS LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN THE PARK SAVOY CATERERS LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?