DR. CONSTANTINE ROSSAKIS MD, PC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DR. CONSTANTINE ROSSAKIS MD, PC
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv07036
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/5/2020. (lag, )
July 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Defendants' First MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief INSO Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying Case, #3 Certification Certification of CSF ISO Motion to Stay, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification of CFS ISO Motion to Stay)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on August 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/7/2020. (as, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 11, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/1/2020. (mfr)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.. (HAGER, RACHEL)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL R. HAGER on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (HAGER, RACHEL)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT F. COSSOLINI on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (COSSOLINI, ROBERT)
June 10, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-2570-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10921961), filed by THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Bergen County Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FINAZZO, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DR. CONSTANTINE ROSSAKIS MD, PC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. CONSTANTINE ROSSAKIS MD, PC
Represented By: FRANCIS J. DEVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Represented By: ROBERT F. COSSOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. FINAZZO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HAGER
Represented By: ROBERT F. COSSOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?