SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D.
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv07043
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/2/2020. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/3/2020. (ams, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter requesting an extension for Defendant to answer out of time, up to 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/23/2020. (ams, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER directing Plaintiff to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/21/2020. (ams, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D.. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
June 10, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10923181), filed by SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY RABINOWITZ, M.D.
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?