GARDEN STATE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, PA et al v. SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: GARDEN STATE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, PA and GARDEN STATE SURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC. and SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2020cv07185
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/23/20. (LM, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED identifying Hartford Financial Services Group as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC. identifying Hartford Financial Services Group as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED.(BROCHIN, JAMES)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint through 7/20/2020, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/22/2020. (lag, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
June 12, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC. identifying HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED identifying HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP as Corporate Parent.. (BROCHIN, JAMES)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-002590-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10936165), filed by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC., SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROCHIN, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARDEN STATE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, PA et al v. SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDEN STATE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, PA
Represented By: FRANCIS J. DEVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDEN STATE SURGICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS J. DEVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, INC.
Represented By: JAMES L. BROCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: JAMES L. BROCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?