GRAY et al v. STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER et al
Plaintiff: IRINA VORONINA and TIFFANY TOTH GRAY
Defendant: 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC. t/a DELILAH'S DEN, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER, STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER and 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07199
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction REPLY BRIEF (PFEIL, DARREN)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, IRINA VORONINA re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC., STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER. Responses due by 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(PFEIL, DARREN)
July 20, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for a Clerk's Extension under Local Rule 6.1(B), attached to the #4 Notice of Appearance submitted by 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC., has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/3/20. (jc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DARREN MATHEW PFEIL on behalf of 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC., STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER (Attachments: #1 Supplement Automatic Extension Pursuant to 6.1(b))(PFEIL, DARREN)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) (jc, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC., STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
June 15, 2020 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC. t/a DELILAH'S DEN, DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10936733) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, IRINA VORONINA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY et al v. STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC. t/a DELILAH'S DEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AS DELILAH'S DEN OF TOMS RIVER
Represented By: DARREN MATHEW PFEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1640 LAKEWOOD ROAD ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: DARREN MATHEW PFEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRINA VORONINA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY TOTH GRAY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?