Gary Sosenko et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Diane Terry, Gary Sosenko and Michael Burrage
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07652
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 106 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
June 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
June 23, 2020 Filing 105 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-00610. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(A) #103 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Having reviewed and considered the Parties' Stipulation to Transfer Action to the District of New Jersey Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), and finding that transfer will serve the convenience of the parties and is in the interests of justice, the Court GRANTS the stipulation and hereby directs the Clerk to transfer the above captioned action to the District of New Jersey. Electronic docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
June 12, 2020 Filing 103 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of New Jersey filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Filing 102 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Girard, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Entering Stipulation for Further Stay of Case Pending Settlement Approval #100 by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: (1) All proceedings in this action, including all discovery and case deadlines, are hereby stayed for 60 days from the date of the Court's order of 4/10/2020 (Dkt. No. #99 ). (2) The Parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court no later than 60 days from the date of the Courts order of 4/10/2020. (jp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 100 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement Approval filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Entering Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Settlement Approval #98 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, as follows: (1) All proceedings in this action, including all discovery and case deadlines, are hereby stayed for 45 days from the date hereof. (2) The Parties are directed to file a joint status report with the Court no later than 45 days from the date of entry of this order. If the parties are unprepared to file a motion for preliminary approval, the Court will likely lift the stay at that time. (jp)
April 7, 2020 Filing 98 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement Approval filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grille, Simon)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #96 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin F Johns APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 96 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin F. Johns to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25710032) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Galdston in Support of Application, #2 Proposed Order) (Galdston, Benjamin)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING Further Extension of Class Certification Briefing Schedule Due to Cyber Incident with Defendant's E-Discovery Vendor Resulting in Unforseeable Delays #93 by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: Last Day to File Motion for Class Certification (and reports of any expert relied upon for class certification): 4/10/2020. Last Day to File Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (and reports of any expert relied upon for opposition to class certification): 5/29/2020. Last Day to File Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification: 6/29/2020. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
March 6, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE (Joint) Regarding Cyber Incident Causing Discovery Delays in Support of the Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding February 26, 2020 Order Granting Motion to Compel (Dkt. 89) filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
March 6, 2020 Filing 93 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Regarding Further Extension of Class Certification Briefing Schedule Due to Cyber Incident with Defendant's E-Discovery Vendor Resulting in Unforseeable Delays [Dkt. Nos. 88, 89, 90] filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
March 2, 2020 Filing 90 STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Statement in Support of the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Modification of Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re: Stipulation for Order #88 . (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
March 2, 2020 Filing 89 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to The Court's February 26, 2020 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents [Dkt. No. 85] filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vassi Iliadis, #2 Declaration of Jeremy Greenfield)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
March 1, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/26/20 10:29 A.M. re Transcript #91 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 1, 2020 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/26/20 10:29 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, phone number(361) 949-2988 10:29 A.M.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (ha)
February 28, 2020 Filing 88 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Modification of Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grille, Simon)
February 26, 2020 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Mae Chester at mae.chester@hoganlovells.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
February 26, 2020 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Schuyler Sandeen at ssandeen@girardsharp.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Grille, Simon)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Motion to Compel #76 . **NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** See Order for details. (kh)
February 26, 2020 Filing 84 MINUTES OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS #76 Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for hearing. Appearances entered. Argument heard. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is GRANTED as reflected on the record. Separate order to issue. Court Recorder: CS 02/26/2020. (kh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 83 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE RE CHANGE OF HEARING LOCATION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 , presently set for February 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6B has been CHANGED AS TO LOCATION ONLY. The matter will now be held in Courtroom 9B, 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2020 Filing 82 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 , presently set for hearing on February 19, 2020, is now CONTINUED to February 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6B. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 5, 2020 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENT to Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #77 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Grille, Simon)
February 5, 2020 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's to Produce additional documents in response to Plaintiffs First and Second Sets of Requests for Production of Documents and Specify an End Date for Production #76 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vassi Iliadis)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
January 23, 2020 Filing 79 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 , presently set for hearing on February 12, 2020, is now CONTINUED to February 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 21, 2020 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Vassi Iliadis re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #77 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
January 21, 2020 Filing 77 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's to Produce additional documents in response to Plaintiffs First and Second Sets of Requests for Production of Documents and Specify an End Date for Production #76 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon S. Grille, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Proposed Order)(Grille, Simon)
January 21, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant's to Produce additional documents in response to Plaintiffs First and Second Sets of Requests for Production of Documents and Specify an End Date for Production filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Grille, Simon)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation for Order #74 . (Discovery cut-off 8/14/2020. Motions due by 9/18/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/11/2021. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.) (Responses due by 5/1/2020, Replies due by 6/4/2020.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (mrgo)
December 26, 2019 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Modification of Case Schedule filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DENIED BY ORDER THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation Regarding Transfer and Coordination of Related Action and Modifying Case Schedule #72 . **The Court declines the parties suggestion that it accept transfer of the Bentley consolidated case for coordination with this case. The case before the Court involves claims brought under California law on behalf of a class of California purchasers. The Bentley consolidated case is pending in the district where Defendant's headquarters is located (see Doc. 72, Stip. at 1), and the consolidated complaint in the Bentley actions asserts claims under the laws of ten states other than California on behalf of purchasers in those ten states.*** (jp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 72 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Transfer and Coordination of Related Action and Modifying Case Schedule filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re Stipulation #70 . (see document for further details) (hr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Electronically Stored Information filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry.(Grille, Simon)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ANSWER #66 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendant may have a further 5-day extension from 10/18/2019, until and including 10/23/2019, to answer the First Amended Complaint. (jp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #45 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Maddigan, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Discovery #65 . (kh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 66 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer now due 10/23/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #45 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Expert Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry.(Grille, Simon)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #63 . (kh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry.(Grille, Simon)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 14 DAYS #58 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s time to answer the First Amended Complaint is extended from 10/4/2019, until and including 10/18/2019. Defendant shall have until 10/18/2019, to answer the First Amended Complaint. (jp)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS #37 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: **NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** (See order for details). (kh)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Court finds Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #37 appropriate for decision without oral argument and takes the matter under submission. No appearance is required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 4, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of address by Victoria Amanda Joseph attorney for Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Changing attorneys address to Hogan Lovells US LLP 1735 Market Street, Floor 22, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Joseph, Victoria)
October 3, 2019 Filing 58 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 18, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition #45 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #51 Non-Resident Attorney Jacob M Polakoff APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #50 Non-Resident Attorney Michaelle E Drake APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #49 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence Deutsch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #48 Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J Carson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #47 Non-Resident Attorney Amey J Park APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, designating Benjamin Galdston as local counsel. (jp)
September 30, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24519982) #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 51 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacob M. Polakoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24520192) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jacob M. Polakoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Galdston, Benjamin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24520084) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Galdston, Benjamin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24520039) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Galdston, Benjamin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 48 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24519982) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Galdston, Benjamin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amey J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24519864) filed by Plaintiff Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Amey J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Galdston, Benjamin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Galdston counsel for Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. Adding Benjamin Galdston as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry and Michael Burrage, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry and Michael Burrage. (Attorney Benjamin Galdston added to party Michael Burrage(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Galdston added to party Gary Sosenko(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Galdston added to party Diane Terry(pty:pla))(Galdston, Benjamin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 45 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Gary Sosenko, Michael Burrage, Diane Terry(Polk, Adam)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, that, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation to Amend Complaint #40 , Plaintiffs may file their First Amended Class Action Complaint by no later than September 20, 2019. The FAC must be served and filed in conformity with Local Rules 15-1 to 15-3. (jp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 43 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Document #37 , presently set for hearing on October 2, 2019, is now CONTINUED to October 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2019 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT to Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, #38 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Grille, Simon)
September 18, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Document #37 Supplemental Memorandum Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2.3 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vassi Iliadis, #2 Exhibit A)(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
September 12, 2019 Filing 40 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Grille, Simon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Michael M. Maddigan re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, #38 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Maddigan, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Document #37 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon S. Grille, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Grille, Simon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Document filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Grille, Simon)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. #17 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion as to Plaintiffs' MMWA claims, and those claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Court DENIES the Motion in all other respects. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A Joseph APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., designating Vassiliki Iliadis as local counsel. (jp)
August 26, 2019 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/20/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24288340) filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER SUBMISSION (Doc. 17) by Judge Josephine L. Staton taking under submission #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. 17.) The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for August 23, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. (bm)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: denying #28 Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Joseph APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Terming Attorney Victoria A Joseph. (bm)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Phoebe A Wilkinson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., designating Vassiliki Iliadis as local counsel. (bm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24288424) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phoebe A. Wilkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24288340) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24288424) filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phoebe A. Wilkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24288340) filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iliadis, Vassiliki)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 11, 2020. (tg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has received and reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc. #22 .) The Scheduling Conference set for hearing 8/2/2019, is VACATED, and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Maddigan, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Conference Report ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry.. (Grille, Simon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Girard, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE #15 by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: On 6/12/2019, Defendant shall file its Motion to Dismiss. At that time, Defendant shall notice the motion for hearing on the earliest available motions hearing date, but no earlier than 8/23/2019. On 7/12/2019, Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. On 7/26/2019, Defendant shall file its Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. (jp)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/2/2019 at 10:30 a.m. (tg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3))(Maddigan, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Maddigan, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying LG Electronics, Inc.. (Maddigan, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maddigan, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY AN ADDITIONAL 15 DAYS #12 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has read and reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation extending Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint by an additional fifteen (15) days. The Court finds good cause to GRANT the Stipulation. Therefore, IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant LG Electronics, USA, Inc.s deadline to respond to the initial complaint is hereby extended by an additional 15-days, from May 28, 2019 until (and including) June 12, 2019. (bm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vassiliki Iliadis on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney Vassiliki Iliadis added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Iliadis, Vassiliki)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 12, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael M. Maddigan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maddigan, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer now due 5/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Maddigan, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael M Maddigan on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Maddigan, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Sosenko, Michael Burrage, Diane Terry, upon Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George, Service of Process Intake Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Polk, Adam)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (lh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, identifying Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry, Michael Burrage, and LG Electronics U.S.A, Inc.. (Polk, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Polk, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burrage, Gary Sosenko, Diane Terry. (Polk, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23475474 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Gary Sosenko, Michael Burrage, Diane Terry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Adam E Polk added to party Michael Burrage(pty:pla), Attorney Adam E Polk added to party Gary Sosenko(pty:pla), Attorney Adam E Polk added to party Diane Terry(pty:pla))(Polk, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Sosenko et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Terry
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sosenko
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?