OBI SHAAIM MAA v. KLEIN
Appellee: SHMUEL KLEIN
Appellant: SAA HETEP OBI SHAAIM MAA
Case Number: 2:2020cv07792
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Shmuel Klein to Clerk of District Court regarding Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018(a) the appellant failed to serve or file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice re Set/Reset Hearings, #2 Designation of Record on Appeal (Bankruptcy),,,,. (KLEIN, SHMUEL)
July 17, 2020 Bankruptcy appeal set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (sm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by SAA HETEP OBI SHAAIM MAA re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Stacey L. Meisel, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Power of Attorney, #2 Statement of Issues, #3 Transmittal of Documents)(sm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-34465, filed by SAA HETEP OBI SHAAIM MAA. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Application, #2 Transmittal of Documents, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OBI SHAAIM MAA v. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHMUEL KLEIN
Represented By: SHMUEL B. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SAA HETEP OBI SHAAIM MAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?