GEIGER et al v. CHEEQUES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SARA UNDERWOOD, URSULA MAYES, BROOKE TAYLOR, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, JESSE GOLDEN, BRENDA GEIGER and EVA PEPAJ
Defendant: CHEEQUES, LLC D/B/A CHEEQUES GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. D/B/A CHEEQUES, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. doing business as CHEEQUES and CHEEQUES, LLC doing business as CHEEQUES GENTLEMAN'S CLUB
Case Number: 2:2020cv08543
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on September 23, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/21/2020. (as, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEEQUES, LLC, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. identifying James S. Cecire, Corp., Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHEEQUES, LLC, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC..(DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 14, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC., CHEEQUES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/29/2020. (ams, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO on behalf of All Defendants (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The attached Civil Cover (JS 44) improperly indicates that the origin of this case is a Reinstated/Reopened case, and that option was chosen when opening the case. Please be advised that the only Origin Codes that should be used when opening a new case are: 1- Original Proceeding, 2 - Notice of Removal or 8 - Directly Filed MDL. Please refrain from using any other Origin Codes when opening your cases. (mfr)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHEEQUES, LLC, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
July 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHEEQUES, LLC D/B/A CHEEQUES GENTLEMEN'S CLUB, JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. D/B/A CHEEQUES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11052688) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BROOKE TAYLOR, URSULA MAYES, SARA UNDERWOOD, JESSE GOLDEN, BRENDA GEIGER, EVA PEPAJ, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEIGER et al v. CHEEQUES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA UNDERWOOD
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: URSULA MAYES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKE TAYLOR
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE GOLDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GEIGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA PEPAJ
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEEQUES, LLC D/B/A CHEEQUES GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. D/B/A CHEEQUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES S. CECIRE CORP., INC. doing business as CHEEQUES
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEEQUES, LLC doing business as CHEEQUES GENTLEMAN'S CLUB
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?