CANAS et al v. SINSATIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS, URSULA MAYES, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, VIDA GUERRA, JESSA HINTON, BRENDA GEIGER, LINA POSADA and JENNIFER ZHARINOVA
Defendant: ASHCREET, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS, SINSATIONS, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS GOGO, SINSATIONS, LLC doing business as SINSATIONS GOGO and ASHCREET, LLC doing business as SINSATIONS
Case Number: 2:2020cv08552
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The attached Civil Cover (JS 44) indicates that the origin of this case is a Reinstated/Reopened case, and those options were chosen when opening the case. Please be advised that the only Origin Codes that should be used when opening a new case are: 1- Original Proceeding, 2 - Notice of Removal or 8 - Directly Filed MDL. Please refrain from using any other Origin Codes when opening your cases. (mfr)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TARA LEIGH PATRICK, VIDA GUERRA, LINA POSADA, BRENDA GEIGER, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, PAOLA CANAS, JESSA HINTON, URSULA MAYES. ASHCREET, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; SINSATIONS, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASHCREET, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS, SINSATIONS, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS GOGO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (sm)
July 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASHCREET, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS, SINSATIONS, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS GOGO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11053025) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TARA LEIGH PATRICK, VIDA GUERRA, LINA POSADA, BRENDA GEIGER, JENNIFER ZHARINOVA, PAOLA CANAS, JESSA HINTON, URSULA MAYES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANAS et al v. SINSATIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: URSULA MAYES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA LEIGH PATRICK
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDA GUERRA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSA HINTON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GEIGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINA POSADA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ZHARINOVA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHCREET, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINSATIONS, LLC D/B/A SINSATIONS GOGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINSATIONS, LLC doing business as SINSATIONS GOGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHCREET, LLC doing business as SINSATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?