BAKER v. LINCOLN PARK BANCORP et al
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKER
Defendant: STEPHEN DORMER, LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY and BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF LINCOLN 1ST BANK
Case Number: 2:2020cv08731
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff. (KOZAN, CRAIG)
September 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Steven Abram Cash: $ 150, receipt number NEW043383 (sm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Abram Cash, Esq. ETC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/25/2020. (McMahon, Peadar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, THERESA)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Certification of S. Cash by LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification Amended Certification of S. Cash)(KELLY, THERESA)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Steven A. Cash Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certification Certification of Theresa A. Kelly, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(KELLY, THERESA)
August 7, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 9/17/20 at 9:30am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/6/20. (tjg, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 201.1(d)(3))(KELLY, THERESA)
July 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (KOZAN, CRAIG)
July 16, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LINCOLN 1ST BANK, LP INVESTMENT COMPANY, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP, LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/3/2020. (ld, )
July 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
July 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
July 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters and in the order that they appear on complaint. All parties must be entered. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, THERESA)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC. (KELLY, THERESA)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LINCOLN PARK BANCORP identifying Lincoln Park Bancorp MHC as Corporate Parent.. (KELLY, THERESA)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LINCOLN 1ST BANK identifying Lincoln Park Bancorp as Corporate Parent.. (KELLY, THERESA)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LP INVESTMENT COMPANY identifying Lincoln 1st Bank as Corporate Parent.. (KELLY, THERESA)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln Park Bancorp MHC, Lincoln 1st Bank, LP Investment Company, Lincoln Park Bancorp from Morris County Superior Court, case number L-00925-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11064320), filed by Lincoln Park Bancorp MHC, Lincoln 1st Bank, LP Investment Company, Lincoln Park Bancorp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KELLY, THERESA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. LINCOLN PARK BANCORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN DORMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN 1ST BANK
Represented By: THERESA A. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN PARK BANCORP
Represented By: THERESA A. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN PARK BANCORP MHC
Represented By: THERESA A. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP INVESTMENT COMPANY
Represented By: THERESA A. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF LINCOLN 1ST BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKER
Represented By: CRAIG KOZAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?