COLSON HEALTH, INC. v. JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC
Plaintiff: COLSON HEALTH, INC.
Defendant: JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv08933
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/10/2020. (ams, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by COLSON HEALTH, INC.. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant JZ Nutritionals LLC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Verified Complaint by 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/30/2020. (ams, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RAY DARBEE on behalf of JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC (DARBEE, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY on behalf of JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, )
July 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLSON HEALTH INC.. (KRIEGEL, MARK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11076761) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COLSON HEALTH INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRIEGEL, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLSON HEALTH, INC. v. JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JZ NUTRITIONALS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLSON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: MARK AARON KRIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?