TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED et al v. NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED and TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.
Defendant: ALVOGEN GROUP, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and ALVOGEN PHARMA US, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08966
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #13 Letter with Proposed Consent Order. The time for Defendants to file their responses to the Complaint is hereby extended until and including 9/14/2020. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/13/2020. (dam, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Proposed Consent Order Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC. ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020.. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/5/2020 (dam, ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.. ALVOGEN GROUP, INC. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.. ALVOGEN PHARMA US, INC. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.. ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.. NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SYLVIA-REBECCA GUTIERREZ on behalf of TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC. (GUTIERREZ, SYLVIA-REBECCA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES H. CHEVALIER on behalf of TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R) (dam, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALVOGEN GROUP, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN PHARMA US, INC., NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC. identifying TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED as Corporate Parent.. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
July 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALVOGEN GROUP, INC., ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ALVOGEN PHARMA US, INC., NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11078790), filed by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2)(GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED et al v. NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN PB RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORWICH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN PHARMA US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: MICHAEL R. GRIFFINGER
Represented By: SYLVIA-REBECCA GUTIERREZ
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL R. GRIFFINGER
Represented By: SYLVIA-REBECCA GUTIERREZ
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?