CRACOLICI v. MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: HELGA CRACOLICI
Defendant: MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES and PHILLIP FLATTERY
Case Number: 2:2020cv08975
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADMITTING JOHN J. MEEHAN, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF HELGA CRACOLICI. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/26/2020. (lag, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 Third MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Meehan by HELGA CRACOLICI. (BARROS, DIEGO)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs letter, D.E. 18, requesting an adjournment of the current return date for Defendant Mahwah Fords pending motions, D.E. 16, 17. The Court grants Plaintiffs request to adjourn the current return date until October 5, 2020. The Court also administratively terminates Defendant Mahwah Fords pending motions, D.E. 16, 17. Plaintiffs opposition is due on or before September 21, 2020 in accordance with the new briefing deadlines accompanying the new return date. Upon Defendant filing its reply which is due on or before September 28, 2020, it shall also submit a letter on the docket requesting the reinstatement of its motions. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/25/2020. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/25/2020. (ro, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER CASAZZA CARTER on behalf of MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES (CARTER, JENNIFER)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #21 Third MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Meehan. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 by HELGA CRACOLICI. (BARROS, DIEGO)
August 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6),, #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 by MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Mason v. Zoom Tech Inc., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ZONGHETTI, GINO)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), by MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Mason v. Zoom Tech Inc., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ZONGHETTI, GINO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/17/20. (LM, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GINO A. ZONGHETTI on behalf of MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES (ZONGHETTI, GINO)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMITTING JON L. NORINSBERG, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF HELGA CRACOLICI, etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/7/2020. (lag, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PHILLIP FLATTERY.(WECKERLY, MICHELE)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELE LYNN WECKERLY on behalf of PHILLIP FLATTERY (WECKERLY, MICHELE)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. TURCHI on behalf of PHILLIP FLATTERY (TURCHI, JOSEPH)
August 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JON L. NORINSBERG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
August 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon L. Norinsberg. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon L. Norinsberg by HELGA CRACOLICI. (BARROS, DIEGO)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER- The Court is in receipt of the application for the pro hac vice admission of Jon L. Norinsberg (see entry no. 3.) The application is incomplete. The application should be supplemented so that it complies fully with Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(1), including providing a statement certifying that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the applicant in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorney in any jurisdiction. The proposed form of order should also reflect that only counsel of record, Diego O. Barros, Esq., may file papers, enter appearances for parties, sign stipulations, etc. consistent with Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(4).. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/6/20. (Newman, Robin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Gino A. Zonghetti, Esq., requesting an Order extending time to answer pursuant to Local Rule 6.1(b). (ZONGHETTI, GINO)
August 5, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Letter submitted by MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/21/2020. (lag, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HELGA CRACOLICI. PHILLIP FLATTERY served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (BARROS, DIEGO)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HELGA CRACOLICI. MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (BARROS, DIEGO)
July 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon L. Norinsberg. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jon L. Norinsberg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11094210.) (BARROS, DIEGO)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon L. Norinsberg by HELGA CRACOLICI. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certificate of Good Standing)(BARROS, DIEGO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILLIP FLATTERY, MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11079390) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HELGA CRACOLICI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb. A, Photos of Injuries, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(BARROS, DIEGO)
July 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRACOLICI v. MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAHWAH FORD SALES & SERVICES
Represented By: GINO A. ZONGHETTI
Represented By: JENNIFER CASAZZA CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP FLATTERY
Represented By: MICHELE LYNN WECKERLY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. TURCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELGA CRACOLICI
Represented By: DIEGO O BARROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?