WILLIAMS v. BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RAHEEM WILLIAMS
Defendant: MAINTENANCE COMPANY "X", COSCO HOME AND OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS, WING ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS, DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC., MANUFACTURING COMPANY "Z", NET MEDIA, LLC, DISTRIBUTION COMPANY "Y", BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., DEFENDANT COMPANY 1-10 and DEFENDANTS 1-10
Cross Defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv09031
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff's cross-motion, inter alia, for leave to file a second amended complaint (ECF No. #15 ) is administratively terminated without prejudice, as it does not comply with (1) Local Civil Rule 15.1(a), which states, inter alia, that the movant "shall attach... a copy of the proposed amended pleading; and... a form of the amended pleading that shall indicate in what respect(s) it differs from the pleading which it proposes to amend, by bracketing or striking through materials to be deleted and underlining materials to be added"; and (2) Local Civil Rule 5.2(8), which requires "all documents referenced as exhibits or attachments, including briefs, [to be filed] in accordance with the Court's requirements found on the website at www.njd.uscourts.gov," wherein the ECF User Manual directs litigants to file attachments and exhibits under separate subheadings at pages 24-26. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a new cross-motion that is compliant by TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 22, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/14/2020. (as, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(CARDONSKY, ROBERT)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel A. Remke, Esq.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2020. (sm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2020. (sm)
September 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
September 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rachel Remke, Esq., #2 Certification Good Standing Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DORFMAN, JULIE)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (DORFMAN, JULIE)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Discovery Plan by NET MEDIA, LLC.(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., COSCO HOME AND OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., DEFENDANT COMPANY 1-10, DEFENDANTS 1-10, DISTRIBUTION COMPANY "Y", LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS, MAINTENANCE COMPANY "X", MANUFACTURING COMPANY "Z", NET MEDIA, LLC, WING ENTERPRISES, INC. by DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC..(DORFMAN, JULIE)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE BROOKE DORFMAN on behalf of DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC. (DORFMAN, JULIE)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., COSCO HOME AND OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC. by LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS.(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RAHEEM WILLIAMS.(CARDONSKY, ROBERT)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC., COSCO HOME AND OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC., DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC. by NET MEDIA, LLC, LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS, WING ENTERPRISES, INC..(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC..(MARTIN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL A. TORTORA on behalf of BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. (TORTORA, NEIL)
July 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on September 9, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/19/2020. (as, )
July 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WING ENTERPRISES, INC., NET MEDIA, LLC from New Jersey Superior Court, Law Div. Union Cty., case number L-3909-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11088768), filed by WING ENTERPRISES, INC., NET MEDIA, LLC.(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINTENANCE COMPANY "X"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSCO HOME AND OFFICE PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as LITTLE GIANT LADDER SYSTEMS
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOREL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JULIE BROOKE DORFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUFACTURING COMPANY "Z"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NET MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRIBUTION COMPANY "Y"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC.
Represented By: NEIL A. TORTORA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAHEEM WILLIAMS
Represented By: SHMUEL TSINMAN
Represented By: ROBERT J. CARDONSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: WING ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?