LESTER et al v. DISCOVER GROWTH FUNDS, LLC
Appellee: DISCOVER GROWTH FUNDS, LLC
Appellant: JEFFREY A. LESTER
In Re: IMMUNE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ET AL.
Case Number: 2:2020cv09469
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Counsel to Chapter 7 Trustee Requesting Adjournment re #7 MOTION For Certification of Direct Appeal To Third Circuit Court of Appeals MOTION for Reconsideration of Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Motion for Certification of Direct Appeal, #5 Designation of Record on Appeal (Bankruptcy),,,,. (RABINOWITZ, JONATHAN)
September 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION For Certification of Direct Appeal To Third Circuit Court of Appeals MOTION for Reconsideration of Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Motion for Certification of Direct Appeal. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION For Certification of Direct Appeal To Third Circuit Court of Appeals MOTION for Reconsideration of Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Motion for Certification of Direct Appeal by JEFFREY A. LESTER. (RABINOWITZ, JONATHAN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION For Certification of Direct Appeal To Third Circuit Court of Appeals, MOTION for Reconsideration of Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Motion for Certification of Direct Appeal by JEFFREY A. LESTER. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C-D, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(RABINOWITZ, JONATHAN)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF OF JEFFREY A. LESTER, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE, IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL FROM ORDER DENYING TRUSTEES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RABINOWITZ, JONATHAN)
August 25, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jc, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by JEFFREY A. LESTER re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Memo, #2 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (jc, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Counsel to Trustee Regarding Deadline to File Certain Reply Papers. (RABINOWITZ, JONATHAN)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DISCOVER GROWTH FUNDS, LLC re #2 Brief (BARNEY, DALE)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 BRIEF of Defendant Discover Growth Fund, LLC in Opposition to the Motion of Jeffrey A. Lester, Chapter 7 Trustee, for Leave to Appeal (BARNEY, DALE)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13273-VFP, filed by JEFFREY A. LESTER. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Case Docket, #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal, #3 Exhibit to Motion, #4 Transmittal) (jc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LESTER et al v. DISCOVER GROWTH FUNDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DISCOVER GROWTH FUNDS, LLC
Represented By: DALE EDWARD BARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JEFFREY A. LESTER
Represented By: JONATHAN I. RABINOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IMMUNE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?