HEINE v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK SAVINGS FUND
Appellant: ELLEN HEINE
Appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK SAVINGS FUND, ROBERT DAVIDOW, ESQ., WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB and ELIZABETH K. HOLDREN, ESQ.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10268
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER extending time for an additional 30 days for Appellant to file the Appellant's Brief, and to submit the relevant documents from the record.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/22/2020. (ld, )
September 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS BRIEF. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF by ELLEN HEINE. (ld, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK SAVINGS FUND (ARCURE, FRANCESCA)
August 25, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (ld, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPELLEE'S COUNTER DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(ld, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by ELLEN HEINE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(ld, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-31041 (VFP), filed by ELLEN HEINE. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion for Proof of Standing, #2 Order Resolving Motion for Relief from Stay, et al, #3 Order_Approving_Payments_in_Installments, #4 Transmittal, #5 Order_Approving_Payments_in_Installments_WITH_SEAL)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEINE v. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK SAVINGS FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ELLEN HEINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK SAVINGS FUND
Represented By: FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE
Represented By: PHILLIP ANDREW RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROBERT DAVIDOW, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Represented By: ELIZABETH K. HOLDREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ELIZABETH K. HOLDREN, ESQ.
Represented By: ELIZABETH K. HOLDREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?