BELAFSKY v. SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. et al
Plaintiff: DR. PETER BELAFSKY
Defendant: SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A., NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC. and NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10358
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Court will conduct a telephone conference with the parties in this matter to discuss the scheduling of a Settlement Conference on October 20, 2020 at 12:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/2020. (ld, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Letter. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PETER BELAFSKY. NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC. waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PETER BELAFSKY. NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC. waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by PETER BELAFSKY AO120 - Report on Filing of Action Regarding A Trademark (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC., NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC., SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (ld, )
August 13, 2020 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by PETER BELAFSKY as to NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC.. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by PETER BELAFSKY as to NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC.. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by PETER BELAFSKY as to SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.. (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by PETER BELAFSKY AO121 - REPORT ON FILING OF ACTION REGARDING COPYRIGHT (GREENBERGER, JORDAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC., NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC., SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11198164) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER BELAFSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nestle Questionnaire, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREENBERGER, JORDAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELAFSKY v. SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. PETER BELAFSKY
Represented By: JORDAN DANIEL GREENBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NESTLE NUTRITION R&D CENTERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NESTLE HEALTHCARE NUTRITION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?