PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RENT-A-CENTER and WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv10376
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENT AUSTIN BOUMA on behalf of RENT-A-CENTER (BOUMA, BRENT)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/23/2020. To join the conference call, dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/5/2020. (jqb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ANDREW JAMES HECK terminated. Attorney COLIN P. HACKETT for RENT-A-CENTER added.. (HACKETT, COLIN)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RENT-A-CENTER.(HECK, ANDREW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. (SUPLEE, DOUGLAS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SUPLEE, DOUGLAS)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Defendant RENT-A-CENTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/2/2020. (dam, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RENT-A-CENTER. (HECK, ANDREW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Rent-A-Center. Attorney ANDREW JAMES HECK for RENT-A-CENTER added. (HECK, ANDREW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY. (KEAHEY, GEORGE)
August 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, )
August 13, 2020 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION from SUPERIOR COURT OF PASSAIC COUNTY, case number PAS L 1996 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11199724), filed by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Statement Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SUPLEE, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENT-A-CENTER
Represented By: BRENT AUSTIN BOUMA
Represented By: ANDREW JAMES HECK
Represented By: COLIN P. HACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: DOUGLAS D. SUPLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA CONTRIBUTIONSHIP INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE B. KEAHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?