BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, BAYER AG and JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10378
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, BAYER AG. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (MILLER, KEITH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, BAYER AG. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (MILLER, KEITH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, KEITH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH identifying Bayer AG as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, KEITH)
August 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11199754), filed by BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, BAYER AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, KEITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYER AG
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?