PERRONE v. BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TATYANA PERRONE and TIMEEKAH MEEKS
Defendant: BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, ALI AHMAD, SANIEA MAJID, ABC CO. 1 THROUGH 10, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC doing business as WEIGHT LOSS AND WELLNESS CENTER and JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv10587
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ALI AHMAD, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, SANIEA MAJID.(SANTARCANGELO, JASON)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CO. 1 THROUGH 10, ALI AHMAD, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10, SANIEA MAJID, filed by TATYANA PERRONE, TIMEEKAH MEEKS.(ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2020 at 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 3C, if conditions permit, before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/22/2020. (kd)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC. (SANTARCANGELO, JASON)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by ALI AHMAD, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, SANIEA MAJID.(SANTARCANGELO, JASON)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TATYANA PERRONE. ALI AHMAD served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; SANIEA MAJID served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALI AHMAD, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, SANIEA MAJID. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by TATYANA PERRONE as to SANIEA MAJID. (ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by TATYANA PERRONE as to BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC. (ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by TATYANA PERRONE as to ALI AHMAD. (ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA F. MCMAHON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MCMAHON, JOSHUA)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALI AHMAD, BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC, SANIEA MAJID ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11216068) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TATYANA PERRONE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANDRYKOVITZ, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRONE v. BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TATYANA PERRONE
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY ANDRYKOVITZ
Represented By: JOSHUA F. MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMEEKAH MEEKS
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY ANDRYKOVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI AHMAD
Represented By: JASON MATTHEW SANTARCANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANIEA MAJID
Represented By: JASON MATTHEW SANTARCANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO. 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBI METABOLIC AND BARIATRIC SERVICES, LLC doing business as WEIGHT LOSS AND WELLNESS CENTER
Represented By: JASON MATTHEW SANTARCANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?