MEDWELL, LLC v. CIGNA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MEDWELL, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20, CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-20, CIGNA CORPORATION, XYZ CORPORATIONS, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., JANE DOES 1-20 and CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv10627
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KELSEY L. KINGSBERY, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/14/2020. (dam)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EDWARD T. KANG, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/14/2020. (dam)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MEDWELL, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand (SALLOUM, CHRISTOPHER)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Declaration of John DiManno)(PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelsey L. Kingsbery, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward T. Kang. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelsey L. Kingsbery by CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 Declaration of Kelsey L. Kingsbery, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward T. Kang by CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 Declaration of Edward T. Kang, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PENARO, STEVEN)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Letter Request to adjourn Plaintiff's motion to remand one motion cycle to October 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/17/20. (jc, )
September 17, 2020 Resetting Deadline as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Steven L. Penaro Requesting Adjournment re #8 MOTION to Remand . (PENARO, STEVEN)
September 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by MEDWELL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Christopher G. Salloum, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SALLOUM, CHRISTOPHER)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Move re #6 Stipulation. The time for Defendants CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTH and LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., and CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is extended. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/24/2020. (dam, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Move by CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Connecticut General Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC. identifying Healthsource, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Connecticut General Life Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA CORPORATION. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of Bergen County NJ, case number BER L 003862 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11218749), filed by CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CIGNA CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Penaro, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PENARO, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDWELL, LLC v. CIGNA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDWELL, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GEORGE SALLOUM
Represented By: VAFA SARMASTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA CORPORATION
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?