STEINv. MAJESCO et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: ROBERT P. RESTREPO, JR., DR. ARUN K. MAHESHWARI, KETAN MEHTA, EARL GALLEGOS, RAJESH HUKKU, CAROLYN JOHNSON, MAJESCO, ADAM ELSTER and SUDHAKAR RAM
Case Number: 2:2020cv10634
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN P. STIGI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John P. Stigi III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11421683.) (KIRBY, SEAN)
September 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER BOSCH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher Bosch to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11408889.) (KIRBY, SEAN)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John P. Stigi III, Esq. and Christopher Bosch, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/23/2020. (ams, )
September 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher Bosch, #2 Text of Proposed Order (includes John P. Stigi and Christopher Bosch)))(KIRBY, SEAN)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John P. Stigi III, #2 Text of Proposed Order (includes John P. Stigi III and Christopher Bosch))(KIRBY, SEAN)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN J. KIRBY on behalf of All Defendants (KIRBY, SEAN)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHIVA STEIN. ADAM ELSTER waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; EARL GALLEGOS waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; RAJESH HUKKU waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; CAROLYN JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; ARUN K. MAHESHWARI waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; MAJESCO waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; KETAN MEHTA waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; SUDHAKAR RAM waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; ROBERT P. RESTREPO, JR waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (MELWANI, GLORIA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADAM ELSTER, EARL GALLEGOS, RAJESH HUKKU, CAROLYN JOHNSON, ARUN K. MAHESHWARI, MAJESCO, KETAN MEHTA, SUDHAKAR RAM, ROBERT P. RESTREPO, JR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADAM ELSTER, EARL GALLEGOS, RAJESH HUKKU, CAROLYN JOHNSON, ARUN K. MAHESHWARI, MAJESCO, KETAN MEHTA, SUDHAKAR RAM, ROBERT P. RESTREPO, JR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11218925) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Shiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MELWANI, GLORIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEINv. MAJESCO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P. RESTREPO, JR.
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ARUN K. MAHESHWARI
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KETAN MEHTA
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL GALLEGOS
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJESH HUKKU
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN JOHNSON
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJESCO
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM ELSTER
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUDHAKAR RAM
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: GLORIA K. MELWANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?