Blackmon et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Blackmon and Melani Blackmon
Defendant: ALLERGAN INC., INAMED CORPORATION, ALLERGAN USA INC. and ALLERGAN PLC
In Re: IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv10652
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Member Case Transferred in on 8/18/20 from the Eastern District of Louisiana 2:20-02104 for MDL 2921 IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02104. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2921. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jeg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2921. (jeg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stephen Blackmon, Melani Blackmon.(Connick, John)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs, Melanie Blackmon, wife of and Stephen Blackmon, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/30/2020.(jeg)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allergan Inc. (cwa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allergan Inc, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to ALLERGAN INC. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Connick, John) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (cwa).
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8415950) filed by Melani Blackmon, Stephen Blackmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Patrick Connick added to party Melani Blackmon(pty:pla), Attorney John Patrick Connick added to party Stephen Blackmon(pty:pla).(Connick, John) Modified on 7/24/2020 (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INAMED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Blackmon
Represented By: John Patrick Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melani Blackmon
Represented By: John Patrick Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?