K.B et al v. PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: KHALI BELL, LASHIA TOOLEY, KING SMITH, KS and KB
Defendant: DANIEL F. RYAN SCHOOL #19, ABC CORP. 1-15, PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION and JOHN DOE 1-15
Case Number: 2:2020cv10660
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (bt, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Passaic County Courthouse77 Hamilton StreetPaterson, NJ 07505-2017 State No: L-002083-20. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (bt, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Letter request to remand this matter back to the Superior Court of Passaic County. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/17/2020. (bt, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Richard D. Picini, Esq.. (PICINI, RICHARD)
September 3, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter requesting to adjourn Motion to Dismiss by one cycle. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/3/2020. (ams, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff Requesting 1 Cycle Adjournment. (PICINI, RICHARD)
August 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by DANIEL F. RYAN SCHOOL #19, PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZIEMAN, BENJAMIN)
August 26, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2020. (bt, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Passaic Board of Education and Daniel F. Ryan School #19. Attorney BENJAMIN HENRY ZIEMAN for DANIEL F. RYAN SCHOOL #19,BENJAMIN HENRY ZIEMAN for PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZIEMAN, BENJAMIN)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DANIEL F. RYAN SCHOOL #19, PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION. Amendment to #2 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and CIS, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZIEMAN, BENJAMIN)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: That Defendants shall file redacted versions of the Notice of Removal and the accompanying attachments in a manner that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) etc. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/19/2020. (bt, )
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.B et al v. PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL F. RYAN SCHOOL #19
Represented By: BENJAMIN HENRY ZIEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSAIC BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: BENJAMIN HENRY ZIEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALI BELL
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASHIA TOOLEY
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING SMITH
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KB
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?