58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC v. WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Plaintiff: 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC
Defendant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION D/B/A PRICERITE SUPERMARKETS and WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION doing business as PRICERITE SUPERMARKETS
Counter Claimant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv10744
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION. (GIBSON, WILLIAM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC by WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GIBSON, WILLIAM)
September 15, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/29/2020. (lag, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ANTHONY ARGIROPOULOS,WILLIAM GIBSON for WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION added. (GIBSON, WILLIAM)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC. WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (HUGHES, WILLIAM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ANDREW GIORDANO on behalf of 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC (GIORDANO, JOSEPH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC. (HUGHES, WILLIAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11226265) with JURY DEMAND, filed by 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continues, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(HUGHES, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC v. WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION D/B/A PRICERITE SUPERMARKETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION doing business as PRICERITE SUPERMARKETS
Represented By: WILLIAM GIBSON
Represented By: ANTHONY ARGIROPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 58 SWANSEA MALL DRIVE, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH ANDREW GIORDANO
Represented By: WILLIAM J. HUGHES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM GIBSON
Represented By: ANTHONY ARGIROPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?