JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: GREGORY A. JONES
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv10760
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioners #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/7/2020. (bt, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to the motion within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this order, ORDERED that Respondent shall raise by way of its answer any appropriate defenses that it wishes the Court to consider, including, with respect to the asserted defenses, relevant legal arguments with citations to appropriate legal authority etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/7/2020. (bt, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Petition to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, In Re to Criminal Case file 16-516, filed by GREGORY A. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bt, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: that Petitioner shall notify the Court within 45 days of the entry of this memorandum and order whether he wishes to have his motion ruled on as filed or whether he wishes to withdraw his motion and submit one all-inclusive 2255 motion that includes all available federal claims etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/21/2020. (bt, )
August 20, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Court Appointed. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, Court Appointed by GREGORY A. JONES. (bt, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 16-516, filed by GREGORY A. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Envelope)(bt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: SVETLANA M. EISENBERG
Represented By: DANIEL V. SHAPIRO
Represented By: JOHN GAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GREGORY A. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?