TROBIANO v. LAGANO et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY TROBIANO
Defendant: FRANK P LAGANO, JR. and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv10793
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Exhibit to #10 Certification, Sealed Exhibit 15 by FRANK P LAGANO, JR. (LAGANO, FRANK)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Certification of Frank Lagano on behalf of FRANK P LAGANO, JR Re #8 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(LAGANO, FRANK)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Frank Lagano Substitute Administrator re #8 Brief in Opposition to Motion by FRANK P LAGANO, JR. (LAGANO, FRANK)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FRANK P LAGANO, JR re #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(LAGANO, FRANK)
September 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Rule 7.1; No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/15/2020. (ams, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . (LAGANO, FRANK)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court advises that the motion to consolidate this action with Civil Action No. 19-4886, which has been filed under Civil Action No. 19-4886 and which is referenced on the docket for this action under ECF No. #2 , has been administratively terminated without prejudice. The pending motion to remand (ECF No. #4 ) will be resolved in due course. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/9/2020. (as, )
September 8, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by ANTHONY TROBIANO. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Brief Brief, #4 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(WALSH, JOHN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from JOHN K. WALSH, JR.. (WALSH, JOHN)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by All Defendants Motion To Consolidate (LAGANO, FRANK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FRANK P LAGANO, JR from SUPERIOR COURT OF BERGEN COUNTY, case number P-000293-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11219669), filed by FRANK P LAGANO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TROBIANO v. LAGANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK P LAGANO, JR.
Represented By: FRANK LAGANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY TROBIANO
Represented By: JOHN K. WALSH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?